EP1662902 - FOOD COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANKEN, H.T.K.M., Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Oliver van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
DUNN, M., The International Foods Network Ltd. Univ. of Reading, earley Gate, Whiteknights Road Reading Berkshire RG6 6BZ / GB | 03 /
PALMER, A.E., UBF Foodsolutions, R & D 3rd Floor, 2200 Cabot Drive Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 04 /
POVEY, Kevin John, Slimfast Foods Ltd Riding Court Road, Datchet Slough Berkshire SL3 9JT / GB | 05 /
SALMON, Peter M., International Foods Network Ltd Univ. of Reading, Earley Gate, WhiteknightsRoad R eading Berkshire RG6 6BZ / GB | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2006/23] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 04764342.4 | 20.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP09359 | Priority number, date | EP20030255641 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03255641 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023018 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662902 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662902 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/035, A23L1/304, A23C9/13 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C9/1315 (EP,US);
A23C9/137 (EP,US);
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/238 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L33/00 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/23] | English: | FOOD COMPOSITION | [2006/23] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 07.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2007 | BE | 14.03.2007 | CH | 14.03.2007 | CY | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | LI | 14.03.2007 | PL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | IE | 20.08.2007 | LU | 20.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CH | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CH | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
LI | 14.03.2007 | ||
PL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5665622 ; | [A]CN1183906 ; | [X]WO9415486 (DANISH CROWN INC AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 7, line 9 - line 14 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 20 - page 23; examples 1-3 * * page 24; claims 1-3,10,12,18,23 *; | [X]EP0626177 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 17 * * page 5; table 1 * * page 11, line 40 - line 41 * * page 15; table 7 *; | [A]US5385748 (BUNGER JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 16 *; | [A]US6228886 (ANDERSON STEVEN N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 47 * * column 12 - column 14; claims 1,11,12,14-20 *; | [AD]US6245803 (ACOSTA PHYLLIS J B [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 8, line 31 *; | [A]US6436464 (EUBER JOHN [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 24 - line 48 * * column 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * column 4, paragraph 2 * * column 5, paragraph 1 * * column 6 - column 7; tables 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 29, Database accession no. 1981-52679D, XP002269670 & JPS5665622 A 19810603 (SAN-EI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 57, Database accession no. 2002-529504, XP002269671 & CN1183906 A 19980610 (YANG D) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [L] - Der kleine "Souci-Fachmann-Kraut", STUTTGART, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, (1991), XP002269669 [L] 1,8 * page 16 * |