EP1658324 - THERMOCHROMIC POLYMER LAYER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEBOTH, Arno Zur Nachtheide 83 12557 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KRIWANEK, Jörg Wodanstrasse 86 13156 Berlin / DE | 03 /
LÖTZSCH, Detlef Droysenstrasse 10 10629 Berlin / DE | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764396.0 | 23.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004EP09415 | Priority number, date | DE20031039442 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339442 | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021627 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658324 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658324 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08K5/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C08L23/04 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | C08K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | THERMOCHROME POLYMERSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/21] | English: | THERMOCHROMIC POLYMER LAYER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID LAYER | [2006/21] | French: | COUCHE POLYMERIQUE THERMOCHROMIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 02.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2004 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | AT | 23.08.2014 | IE | 23.08.2014 | LU | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/51] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
AT | 23.08.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09235545 ; | [X]KR20030016589 ; | [X]EP1211300 (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO0208821 (SKYRAD LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09235545 A 19970909 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 56, Database accession no. 2003-594820, XP002308430 & KR20030016589 A 20030303 (SUNTECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,8 * abstract * | by applicant | WO0208821 | EP1084860 | US5527385 | US2002037421 | US4121010 | JPH09235545 | KR20030016589 | EP1211300 | EP1157802 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01 | - "WPI", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2003-594820 |