EP1658306 - DELTA 15 -D-HOMOSTEROIDS HAVING AN ANDROGENIC EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Schering AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin-Wedding / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYRWA, Ralf Burgstrasse 47 07751 Rothenstein / DE | 02 /
RING, Sven Ziegenhainer Oberweg 3 07749 Jena / DE | 03 /
KAUFMANN, Günter Schillbachstrasse 41 07743 Jena / DE | 04 /
ELGER, Walter Schorlemerallee 12b 14195 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Birgitt Damaschkeweg 19 07745 Jena / DE | [2006/21] | Application number, filing date | 04764445.5 | 19.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004EP09468 | Priority number, date | DE2003139532 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339532 | US20030496669P | 21.08.2003 Original published format: US 496669 P | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021573 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658306 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, C07J75/00, // A61K31/56, A61P5/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C07J63/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | C07J63/00, C07J75/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | 17.03.2006 | HR | 17.03.2006 | LT | 17.03.2006 | LV | 17.03.2006 | MK | 17.03.2006 | Title | German: | DELTA 15 -D-HOMOSTEROIDE MIT ANDROGENER WIRKUNG | [2006/21] | English: | DELTA 15 -D-HOMOSTEROIDS HAVING AN ANDROGENIC EFFECT | [2006/21] | French: | DELTA 15 -D-HOMOSTEROIDES A EFFET ANDROGENE | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1054262 (GORDON ALAN HUGHES, HERCHEL SMITH) [A] 1 * page 4, column LEFT *; | [A]US4057561 (FURST ANDOR, et al) [A] 1 * column 6 *; | [A]GB1564144 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [A] 1 * page 4, column LEFT *; | [A]GB1569221 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [A] 1 * page 2 *; | [PX]WO2004032897 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [PX] 1-3,5,6,12,17-21 * page 12, lines 9,10 *; | [DA] - M.A.AVERY ET AL., "Synthesis and Testing of 17a beta-hydroxy-7alpha-methyl-D-homo estra-4,16-dien-3-one: a highly potent orally active androgen", STEROIDS, (1990), vol. 55, pages 59 - 64, XP002311163 [DA] 1-12,17-21 * the whole document * | [A] - JANOS WÖLFLING ET AL., "Synthesis of novel halogen-containing D-Homoestrone and 13alpha-D-homoestrone derivatives by Lewis acid-induced intramolecular Prins Reaction", TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, pages 6851 - 6861, XP002311164 [A] 13-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(02)00742-1 |