EP1664307 - NOVEL ENDOSPERM-SPECIFIC PLANT PROMOTER FOR CULTIVATED PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maltagen Forschung GmbH Schaarstrasse 1 56626 Andernach / DE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAHL, Rainer Antoniterstrasse 65 53179 Bonn / DE | 02 /
DARGATZ, Harald Kelterbaum 1 56626 Andernach / DE | 03 /
LÜHRS, Renate Dornenkreuzstrasse 1b 53227 Bonn / DE | 04 /
BERKEMEYER, Matthias Obere Teichstrasse 41 8010 Graz / AT | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Ahrens, Gabriele Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A 38102 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/23] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764721.9 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP09762 | Priority number, date | DE20031043326 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10343326 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026366 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664307 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664307 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/11, A01H5/10 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/8234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUER ENDOSPERMSPEZIFISCHER PFLANZENPROMOTOR FÜR KULTURPFLANZEN | [2006/23] | English: | NOVEL ENDOSPERM-SPECIFIC PLANT PROMOTER FOR CULTIVATED PLANTS | [2006/23] | French: | NOUVEAU PROMOTEUR DE PLANTE SPECIFIQUE DE L'ENDOSPERME POUR PLANTES CULTIVEES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | IE | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | LU | 02.09.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
LU | 02.09.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
LU | 02.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | IE | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | NL | 11.03.2009 | |
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | NL | 11.03.2009 | |
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X] - ZHANG, H. ET AL., "Barley ESTs from germinating seeds - Hordeum vulgare subsp. vulgare", EMBL, (20021108), Database accession no. CA002146, URL: EBI, XP002316563 [X] 1-11 * 81, 977% Identität in 172 nt overlap (gesamte Länge des Fragments 291 nt) von CA002146 mit SEQ ID NO: 1 der Anmeldung *; column A * | [A] - RODRIGUEZ-PALENZUELA P ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE AND ENDOSPERM-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF THE STRUCTURAL GENE FOR THE TOXIN ALPHA HORDOTHIONIN IN BARLEY (HORDEUM-VULGARE L)", GENE, AMSTERDAM, (1988), vol. 70, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 271 - 281, XP002316562 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(88)90199-0 |