EP1663921 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALOALKANES FROM ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Correction of patent specification | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEGMANN, Veit Galileistr. 13 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
MASSONNE, Klemens Höhenweg 8 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Ellwanger, Arndt Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Ellwanger, Arndt Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764917.3 | 07.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP09974 | Priority number, date | DE20031041308 | 08.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341308 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005026089 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663921 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663921 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1663921 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1663921 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/16 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C07C17/16 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/16, C07C19/00 (EP,US);
C07C17/16, C07C19/01 (US,EP);
C07C17/16, C07C19/075 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALOGENALKANEN AUS ALKOHOLEN | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALOALKANES FROM ALCOHOLS | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ALCANES HALOGENES A PARTIR D'ALCOOLS | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2008
08.02.2008
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE | [2008/11] | 07.03.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.08.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.01.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.07.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | EE | 02.05.2007 | IE | 02.05.2007 | PL | 02.05.2007 | RO | 02.05.2007 | SI | 02.05.2007 | SK | 02.05.2007 | TR | 02.05.2007 | BG | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | LU | 07.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
LU | 07.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 02.05.2007 | |
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
IE | 02.05.2007 | ||
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 02.05.2007 | |
PL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | PL | 02.05.2007 | |
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | PL | 02.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH589015 (LONZA AG) [X] 1-4,6,10,14 * the whole document * [I] 5,7-9,11,15; | [DXI]EP0428166 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-4,6,9 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [X]US5723704 (DEMAIL HERVE [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,12,15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5767330 (METZ JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,8; | [DI] - REN, R.X. ET AL, "Mild conversion of alcohols to alkyl halides using halide-based ionic liquids at room temperature", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2001), vol. 3, no. 23, pages 3727 - 3728, XP002319406 [DI] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol016672r | Opposition | JPH04934646B | US3607953 | US4115390 | JPS56150026 | US5233108 | - "Pyridine hydrochloride", PRODUKTINFORMATION, FIRMA SIGMA-ALDRICH | - GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 5, pages 303 - 305 | - Organikum, WEINHEIM, WILEY-VCH, (2001), pages 226 - 227 |