EP1793947 - FOLLOW-ON COMPOSITE TOOL FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED FOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/24] | FOLLOW-ON COMPOSITE TOOL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED FOILS | ||
[2008/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unimet GmbH Aggensteinstrasse 8-10 87669 Rieden / DE | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLB, Rudi Fischerbichl 23 87629 Füssen-Hopfen / DE | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Kloiber, Thomas, et al VKK Patentanwälte Edison Strasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Kloiber, Thomas, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Edison Strasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Kloiber, Thomas, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Patentanwälte Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 04764996.7 | 09.09.2004 | [2007/24] | WO2004EP10061 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027008 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793947 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793947 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21D13/02, B21D28/26, B21D35/00 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
B21D13/02 (EP);
B21D35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLGEVERBUNDWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG STRUKTURIERTER FOLIEN | [2008/17] | English: | FOLLOW-ON COMPOSITE TOOL FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED FOILS | [2008/17] | French: | OUTIL COMPOSITE PROGRESSIF POUR PRODUIRE DES FEUILLES STRUCTUREES | [2007/24] |
Former [2007/24] | FOLGEVERBUNDWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG STRUKTURIERTER FOLIEN | ||
Former [2007/24] | FOLLOW-ON COMPOSITE TOOL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED FOILS | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IE | 17.12.2008 | PL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | LU | 09.09.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | EE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
LU | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | EE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1301667 (ASSOCIATED ENGINEERING LIMITED) [X] 1,3,5,9,12,14-16,19,20 * page 1, line 15 - line 28 * * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 46; figures 1-5,9 *; | [Y]EP1396298 (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]) [Y] 14-21 * column 1, line 23 - line 28 *; | [Y]WO2004072446 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE], et al) [Y] 14-21 * page 5, line 4 - page 15, line 10 * * page 22, line 18 - page 24, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP1457275 (UNIMET GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-5,9,14-22* figures 1-10; claims 1-23 * |