EP1680240 - PRODUCTION OF IHU COMPONENTS WITH A FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDZIAK, Kai-Uwe Setzenhorst 9 21435 Stelle / DE | [2006/29] | Application number, filing date | 04765105.4 | 11.09.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004EP10182 | Priority number, date | DE2003150145 | 28.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10350145 | [2006/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051562 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680240 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D26/02 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
B21C37/0815 (EP,US);
B21C37/0803 (EP,US);
B21C37/14 (EP,US);
B21C37/15 (EP,US);
B21D19/08 (EP,US);
B21D26/033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGEN VON IHU-BAUTEILEN MIT FLANSCH | [2006/29] | English: | PRODUCTION OF IHU COMPONENTS WITH A FLANGE | [2006/29] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PIECES PRODUITES PAR DEFORMATION PAR HAUTE PRESSION INTERNE ET POURVUES D'UNE BRIDE | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 23.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0942794 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 12; figures 1a-1e; claims 1,5 * [Y] 3; | [YA]DE10141503 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-5; claims 1,3 * [A] 1,2,4-6; | [A]EP0127954 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5070717 (BOYD DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 4-11 * |