EP1673362 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHROMANE DERIVATIVES THAT ARE DEVOID OF ENANTIOMERS AND ARE SUBSTITUTED IN POSITION 2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVANT, Ralf DI verstorben / DE | 02 /
BOKEL, Heinz-Hermann Gundolfstrasse 2 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
REUBOLD, Helmut Südring 20 64732 Bad König / DE | 04 /
PFLUG, Herbert Carlo-Mierendorff-Strasse 8 64354 Reinheim / DE | 05 /
KNIERIEME, Ralf Sudetenstrasse 16 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | [2006/26] | Application number, filing date | 04765299.5 | 16.09.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004EP10399 | Priority number, date | DE2003148257 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10348257 | [2006/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005037817 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1673362 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/58, C07D311/66 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
C07D311/66 (EP);
C07D311/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 17.02.2006 | LV | 17.02.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ENANTIOMERENREINEN, IN 2-POSITION SUBSTITUIERTEN CHROMANDERIVATEN | [2006/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHROMANE DERIVATIVES THAT ARE DEVOID OF ENANTIOMERS AND ARE SUBSTITUTED IN POSITION 2 | [2006/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DERIVES DE CHROMANE SUBSTITUES EN POSITION 2, EXEMPTS D'ENANTIOMERES | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - A. STREITWIESER, C.H. HEATHCOCK, organische chemie, WEINHEIM, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), XP002317016 [X] 1-7 * page 578, chapter 18.9.3.3, page 590, chapter 18.11.2, page 588, chapter 18.10.4, page 926, chapter 27.6.5 * | [X] - CH. B. CHAPLEO, "alpha-Adrenoreceptor Reagents. 2. Effects of Modification of the 1,4-Benzodioxan Ring System on alpha-Adrenoreceptor Activity", J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, pages 570 - 576, XP002317015 [X] 1-7 * page 570, scheme I plus paragraph below * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00371a003 |