EP1678843 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OUTER LOOP POWER CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/13] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 S-237 36 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Lennart Annies Väg 6 S-266 97 Hjärnarp / SE | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/13] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2006/28] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 04765929.7 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004EP11388 | Priority number, date | US20030511640P | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 511640 P | US20040763969 | 23.01.2004 Original published format: US 763969 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005041439 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1678843 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678843 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/12, H04W52/24 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/004 (KR);
H04L1/203 (KR);
H04W52/24 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG MIT ÄUSSERER SCHLEIFE | [2006/28] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OUTER LOOP POWER CONTROL | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE A BOUCLE EXTERNE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2004 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | IE | 12.10.2016 | LU | 12.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.10.2004 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.10.2004 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6374118 (TOSKALA ANTTI [FI], et al) [Y] 1,7,13,14 * figure 4.a * * column 4, line 11 - line 28 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 40 *; | [XY]WO0243275 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,10-14 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US2002187802 (AGIN PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 29,30 * paragraph [0090] ** paragraphs [0101] - [0107] *; | [A]WO03017527 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 15 - page 16 * * page 20, paragraph 1086 - page 22, paragraph 1092 *; | [A]US2003054849 (KOO CHANG-SOO [US], et al) [A] 29,30 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0067] *; | [YX]EP1353456 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,7,13,14 * page 7, paragraph 58 - paragraph 65 * * figures 6,7,9 * * page 6, paragraph 46 - paragraph 54 * * page 10, paragraph 102 - paragraph 110 * * claims 7-9 * * page 9, paragraph 86 - page 11, paragraph 120 * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0157] * [X] 29,30,15,17,18,21,22,24,25,28; | [PX]EP1361677 (EVOLIUM SAS [FR]) [PX] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0048] - [0053] * * claims 1,5 *; | [PX]WO2004070984 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 15-28 * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] *; | [Y] - URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_10/Liaison%20Statements/Incoming/PDFs/R1-00-0183.pdf, (20000118), XP002317700 [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_09/Docs/Zips/R4-99850.zip, (19991207), XP002317682 [A] 1-12 * abstract * |