EP1664543 - FUEL PUMP FOR A FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEICHMANN, Johannes Ludwigsecker Strasse 17 36211 Alheim-Sterkelshausen / DE | 02 /
GEISSEL, Eberhard Steinhauck 1a 36093 Künzell / DE | 03 /
JAEGER, Bernd Gewerbering 17 34560 Fritzlar / DE | [2006/23] | Application number, filing date | 04766381.0 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP51673 | Priority number, date | DE2003141837 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341837 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026556 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664543 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04D5/00 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
F04D5/005 (EP,US);
F02M37/04 (KR);
F02M37/10 (KR);
F04D5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/50] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFPUMPE F R EINEN KRAFTSTOFFBEH LTER | [2006/23] | English: | FUEL PUMP FOR A FUEL TANK | [2006/23] | French: | POMPE A CARBURANT DESTINEE A UN RESERVOIR A CARBURANT | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2001026757 (MARX PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3139232 (PETERSON ORVILLE N) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 6 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 29 - line 32 *; | [PX]DE10327573 (TI GROUP AUTOMOTIVE SYS LLC [US]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2662479 (WEISENBACH CHARLES O, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |