EP1719291 - Method, intermediate station and central control unit for the packet-switched data transmission in a self-organizing radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/45] | METHOD, INTERMEDIATE STATION AND CENTRAL CONTROL UNIT FOR THE PACKET-SWITCHED DATA TRANSMISSION IN A SELF-ORGANIZING RADIO NETWORK | ||
[2010/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERMANNS, Sebastian Im Park 5 46395 Bocholt / DE | [2006/45] | Application number, filing date | 04766490.9 | 13.08.2004 | [2006/45] | WO2004EP51787 | Priority number, date | DE20041008905 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004008905 | [2006/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005081454 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719291 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1719291 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H04W28/16 (EP,KR);
H04W72/04 (KR);
H04W88/04 (EP,KR);
H04W84/12 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren, Zwischenstation sowie zentrale Steuereinrichtung zur Paketvermittelten Datenübertragung in einem selbstorganisierten Funknetzwerk | [2010/34] | English: | Method, intermediate station and central control unit for the packet-switched data transmission in a self-organizing radio network | [2010/34] | French: | Procédé, station intermediaire et dispositif de controle central pour transmettre des données commutées en paquets dans un réseau radio à organisation autonome | [2010/34] |
Former [2006/45] | VERFAHREN, ZWISCHENSTATION SOWIE ZENTRALE STEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR PAKETVERMITTELTEN DATEN ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM SELBSTORGANISIERTEN FUNKNETZWERK | ||
Former [2006/45] | METHOD, INTERMEDIATE STATION AND CENTRAL CONTROL UNIT FOR THE PACKET-SWITCHED DATA TRANSMISSION IN A SELF-ORGANIZING RADIO NETWORK | ||
Former [2006/45] | PROCEDE, STATION INTERMEDIAIRE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE CENTRAL POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNEES COMMUTEES EN PAQUETS DANS UN RESEAU RADIO A ORGANISATION AUTONOME | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 27.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IE | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | AT | 13.08.2011 | LU | 13.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
AT | 13.08.2011 | ||
LU | 13.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
AT | 13.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 05.01.2011 | |
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A] - GERLA M ET AL, "MULTICLUSTER, MOBILE, MULTIMEDIA RADIO NETWORK", WIRELESS NETWORKS, ACM, US, (19951001), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 255 - 265, XP000538239 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [03.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01200845 | [A] - MANGOLD, HABETHA, CHOI, NGO, "Co-existence and Interworking of IEEE 802.11a and ETSI BRAN HiperLan/2 in MultiHop Scenarios", THIRD IEEE WORKKSHOP ON WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS, BOSTON, USA, (20010927), pages 1 - 23, XP002314223 [A] 1-9 * page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * page 19, paragraph IV * |