EP1667910 - METHOD FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/24] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS AND ARRAY OF PACKAGED PRODUCTS | ||
[2011/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean Virginia 22101-3883 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN ELZEN, Marinus Johannes Henricus Maria Mars B.V. P.O. Box 31 5460 BB Veghel / NL | 02 /
VAN LIEMPD, Albertus Cornelis Hendrikus Mars B.V. P.O. Box 31 5460 BB Veghel / NL | [2011/11] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
VAN DEN ELZEN, Marinus Johannes Henricus Maria Mars B.V. P.O. Box 31 NL-5460 BB Veghel / NL | ||
02 /
VAN LIEMPD, Albertus Cornelis Hendrikus Mars B.V. P.O. Box 31 NL-5460 BB Veghel / NL | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/24] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04766543.5 | 19.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004EP51843 | Priority number, date | EP20030103206 | 20.08.2003 Original published format: EP 03103206 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019036 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667910 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667910 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/04, B65B9/02 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
B65B9/045 (EP,US);
B65B5/02 (US);
B65B25/005 (EP,US);
B65B35/10 (US);
B65B51/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERPACKUNG VON PRODUKTEN | [2011/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS | [2011/08] | French: | PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUITS | [2011/08] |
Former [2006/24] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERPACKUNG VON PRODUKTEN UND ANORDNUNG VON VERPACKTEN PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2006/24] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS AND ARRAY OF PACKAGED PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2006/24] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUITS, ET ENSEMBLE DE PRODUITS EMBALLES | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184362.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 11.11.2010 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | PT | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | IE | 19.08.2011 | LU | 19.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HU | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
LU | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 19.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH421801 (BOCKENHEIMER BROTFABRIK FERDIN [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US3353329 (CLOUD CHARLES E, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB1297000 (CAMPBELL TAGGART) [X] 12,14 * page 6, line 22 - line 52; figures X-XI * [Y] 8,13; | [A]US4034536 (MAHAFFY REID A, et al) [A] 12 * abstract *; | [XY]US4154636 (MOTOYAMA SHIMESU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-11 * abstract * [Y] 6,8; | [A]US4506495 (ROMAGNOLI ANDREA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4604852 (BECKER GERT [DE]) [Y] 6,13 * abstract * | by applicant | US4034536 | US4604852 |