EP1670448 - HCV INHIBITING SULFONAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/25] | HCV INHIBITIING SULFONAMIDES | ||
[2007/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tibotec Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Eastgate Village Eastgate Little Island Co Cork / IE | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Tibotec Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Little Island Co Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMEN, Kenneth Alan Boterbloemenlaan 35 B-3080 Tervuren / BE | 02 /
VAN ACKER, Koenraad Lodewijk August Uilenberg 30 B-9140 Temse / BE | 03 /
WIGERINCK, Piet Tom Bert Paul Kardinaal Cardijnstraat 29 B-2840 Terhagen / BE | 04 /
SURLERAUX, Dominique Louis Nestor Ghislain rue de la scaillée, 13 B-1440 Braine-le-château / BE | 05 /
DAMS, Géry Karel Julia Nieuwe Erven 11 B-3583 Paal-Beringen / BE | 06 /
QUIRYNEN, Ludo Maria Marcel Katelijnestraat 19F B-2320 Hoogstraten / BE | 07 /
HERTOGS, Kurt Mechelbaan 522, bus 5 B-2580 Putte / BE | 08 /
PAUWELS, Rudi Wilfried Jan Chemin de Layaz 3 CH-1806 Saint-Légier La Chiésaz / CH | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Daelemans, Frank F.R. Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA J&J Patent Law Department Generaal De Wittelaan L 11B 3 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Daelemans, Frank F.R. Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA, Generaal De Wittelaan L11B3 2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 04766871.0 | 30.09.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004EP52388 | Priority number, date | EP20030103629 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03103629 | US20030507535P | 01.10.2003 Original published format: US 507535 P | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030194 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670448 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1670448 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/18, A61K31/426, A61K31/421, A61P31/14 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/421, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/426, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | 02.05.2006 | HR | 02.05.2006 | LT | 02.05.2006 | LV | 02.05.2006 | MK | 02.05.2006 | Title | German: | HCV-HEMMENDE SULFONAMIDE | [2006/25] | English: | HCV INHIBITING SULFONAMIDES | [2007/18] | French: | SULFONAMIDES INHIBANT LE HCV | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/25] | HCV INHIBITIING SULFONAMIDES | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 29.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.11.2007 | CZ | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | EE | 21.11.2007 | FI | 21.11.2007 | RO | 21.11.2007 | SI | 21.11.2007 | SK | 21.11.2007 | BG | 21.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | HU | 22.05.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
RO | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 21.11.2007 | |
SI | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 21.11.2007 | |
BG | 21.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6514953 (ARMITAGE IAN GORDON [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, paragraph 2 * * claims *; | [A]WO03064416 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims *; | [A]US2003050229 (SOMMADOSSI JEAN-PIERRE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [ADY]WO9506030 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * examples 17A,17B,18C,19B,20C,21C * * page 240 - page 244 * [Y] 15,16; | [YD]WO03053435 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [YD] 15,16 * page 31 *; | [A] - JOHANSSON ANJA ET AL, "Acyl sulfonamides as potent protease inhibitors of the hepatitis C virus full-length NS3 (protease-helicase/NTPase): A comparative study of different C-terminals.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20030612), vol. 11, no. 12, ISSN 0968-0896 (ISSN print), pages 2551 - 2568, XP002272318 [A] 1-14 * compounds 45a,45b,46a,46b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(03)00179-2 | [Y] - PALMON RON ET AL, "Lack of hepatotoxicity associated with nonnucleoside reverse transcriptase inhibitors.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (20020401), Database accession no. NLM11917237, XP002319202 [Y] 15,16 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROMES (1999) 1 APR 2002, (20020401), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 1525-4135, pages 340 - 345 | [PY] - ROCKSTROH JÜRGEN KURT, "Management of hepatitis B and C in HIV co-infected patients.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200309), Database accession no. NLM14562859, XP002319203 [PY] 15,16 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROMES (1999) SEP 2003, (200309), vol. 34 Suppl 1, ISSN 1525-4135, pages S59 - S65 |