EP1652763 - BICYCLE PROPULSION SYSTEM AND PRODUCT THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martinez Martinez, José C/ Poeta Llombart 143 - 2 46520 Puerto de Sagunto - Valencia / ES | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L., Paseo de la Castellana, 72-1 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04766981.7 | 21.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004ES70057 | Priority number, date | ES20030001715 | 22.07.2003 Original published format: ES 200301715 | [2006/18] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005009830 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652763 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62J25/00, B62K3/16, B62K3/02, B62M3/02 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
B62K3/005 (EP,US);
B62J25/00 (ES);
B62K3/16 (ES);
B62M3/02 (ES);
B62M3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRADANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND SO ERHALTENES PRODUKT | [2006/18] | English: | BICYCLE PROPULSION SYSTEM AND PRODUCT THUS OBTAINED | [2006/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROPULSION POUR BICYCLETTE ET PRODUIT AINSI OBTENU | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2006 | Translation filed | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]BE398350 ; | [A]FR789581 ; | [A]FR45668E ; | [A]FR896837 ; | [X]WO9321058 (JACQUES ANDRE [CA]); | [Y]WO9828182 (HELICAL DYNAMICS INT INC [BB], et al); | [A]GB2348408 (CHALICE SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) |