Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006223891 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR01462 | 11.06.2004 | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006527240 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR01462 | 11.06.2004 | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1641445 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR01462 | 11.06.2004 | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2529204 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR01462 | 11.06.2004 | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2855970 | 17.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2869538 | 04.08.2006 | B1 | FR2869538 | 04.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005002560 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005065218 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0307176 | 13.06.2003 | FR0404639 | 30.04.2004 |