EP1646753 - METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF A SECTION OF RACK ON A SELF-RAISING OIL PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTEEL FRANCE 5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine St Denis Cedex / FR | For all designated states Civad SA Z.I. Henri Paul 71210 Montchanin / FR | [2012/46] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states INDUSTEEL FRANCE Immeuble La Pacific,La Défense 7 11-13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
For all designated states Civad SA Z.I. Henri Paul 71210 Montchanin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDAMONE, David 32bis, rue du 19 mars 1962 F-71210 ECUISSES / FR | 02 /
MABELLY, Philippe 75, route de Couches F-71670 LE BREUIL / FR | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Lagrange, Jacques Etienne M.M., et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75411 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2012/34] |
Former [2006/16] | Lagrange, Jacques Etienne M.M., et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04767512.9 | 29.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004FR01668 | Priority number, date | FR20030008057 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0308057 | [2006/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005012649 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646753 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646753 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/08, B23K31/02, B23K37/00, B23K9/02, B23K37/02 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
E02B17/0818 (EP,US);
E02B17/08 (KR);
B23K31/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49462 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49616 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENSETZEN EINER ZAHNSTANGE FÜR EINE SICH SELBSTHEBENDE ÖLPLATFORM | [2006/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF A SECTION OF RACK ON A SELF-RAISING OIL PLATFORM | [2006/16] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN TRONCON DE CREMAILLERE DE PLATE-FORME PETROLIERE AUTO-ELEVATRICE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2004 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | [2015/44] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 22.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60154875 ; | [A]DE1104641 (RICHARD C STANLEY) [A] 10,11* the whole document *; | [A]US3967457 (LOVIE PETER M) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 49; figures 3,7,8 *; | [A]EP0645496 (TECHNIP GEOPRODUCTION [FR]) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2719615 (TECHNIP GEOPRODUCTION [FR]) [A] 1,7,8,10,11 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 9; figures 3-6 * * page 7, line 28 - line 31 *; | [A]FR2719611 (TECHNIP GEOPRODUCTION [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 7, line 7 - line 10; figures 4,5 *; | [PXA]WO2004004959 (TECHNIP FRANCE [FR], et al) [PX] 1,4,5,8,9 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - page 10, line 25 * [PA] 10,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851214), vol. 009, no. 319, Database accession no. (M - 439), & JP60154875 A 19850814 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 10,11 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2719615 |