EP1648667 - METHOD OF CUTTING A PLASTIC FUNCTIONAL FILM WHICH IS APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE, SUCH AS A GLASS SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE "Les Miroirs", 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARREC, Ronan 21, place de la Croix Blanche F-60200 Compiegne / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Teyssedre, Laurent, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Teyssedre, Laurent, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Lucas, Francois Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135 F-93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04767672.1 | 13.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004FR01842 | Priority number, date | FR20030050342 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0350342 | [2006/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016604 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648667 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/08, B26F1/38, C03C17/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C03C17/32 (EP,KR,US);
B26D7/08 (KR);
B26D7/086 (EP,US);
C03C17/28 (KR);
C03C2218/328 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0267 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINER FUNKTIONALEN KUNSTSTOFFFOLIE, DIE AUF EINEM TRÄGER, WIE ZUM BEISPIEL EINER GLASSCHEIBE, AUFGEBRACHT WIRD | [2006/17] | English: | METHOD OF CUTTING A PLASTIC FUNCTIONAL FILM WHICH IS APPLIED TO A SUBSTRATE, SUCH AS A GLASS SHEET | [2006/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECOUPE D'UN FILM FONCTIONNEL EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE APPLIQUE SUR UN SUBSTRAT TEL QU'UNE PLAQUE DE VERRE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5733081 (DOWDLE BARTON K [US], et al) [X] 19,20 * column 1 - column 2 * * column 8 - column 9 * * abstract * [A] 1-18; | [A]DE4100344 (ELOTECH GMBH ELEKTRONIK LOBENS [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]EP1022100 (ULTEX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0000329 (INTERFACE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0999188 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document * |