EP1671130 - METHOD FOR DISCRIMINATING BETWEEN ISCHEMIC AND HAEMORRHAGIC STROKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrophoretics Limited Coveham House Downside Bridge Road Cobham Surrey KT11 3EP / GB | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESCUYER, Pierre 2, rue du Chablais F-74100 Annemasse / FR | 02 /
HOCHSTRASSER, Denis François Chemin de la Savonniere 27 CH-1245 Geneva / CH | 03 /
SANCHEZ, Jean-Charles 6 Chemin des Cottonets CH-1223 Bernex / CH | 04 /
ALLARD, Laure Residence 'Le Clos des Vignes', 44 A Rue des Vignes F-74240 Gaillard / FR | 05 /
GUILLAUME, Elisabeth 76 Grande Rue F-01220 Divonne Les Bains / FR | [2010/41] |
Former [2006/25] | 01 /
LESCUYER, Pierre 2, rue du Chablais F-74100 Annemasse / FR | ||
02 /
HOCHSTRASSER, Denis François Chemin de la Savonniere 27 CH-1245 Geneva / CH | |||
03 /
SANCHEZ, Jean-Charles 6 Chemin des Cottonets CH-1223 Bernex / CH | |||
04 /
ALLARD, Laure Residence 'Le Clos des Vignes' 44 A Rue des Vignes F-74240 Gaillard / FR | |||
05 /
GUILLAUME, Elisabeth 76 Grande Rue F-01220 Divonne Les Bains / FR | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/25] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road GB-Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768075.6 | 16.08.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004GB03512 | Priority number, date | GB20030019167 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0319167 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017523 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1671130 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1671130 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
G01N2333/4709 (EP,US);
G01N2333/775 (EP,US);
G01N2333/8128 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2871 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG ZWISCHEN ISCHÄMISCHEM UND HÄMORRHAGISCHEM SCHLAGANFALL | [2006/25] | English: | METHOD FOR DISCRIMINATING BETWEEN ISCHEMIC AND HAEMORRHAGIC STROKE | [2006/25] | French: | METHODE POUR FAIRE LA DIFFERENCE ENTRE UN ACCIDENT CEREBRAL ISCHEMIQUE ET HEMORRAGIQUE | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
PT | 14.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4801531 (FROSSARD PHILIPPE M [US]) [A] 1-27,32-34 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0164008 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [X] 1-27,32-34 * the whole document *; | [X] - ALTES A ET AL, "Hemostatic disturbances in acute ischemic stroke: A study of 86 patients", ACTA HAEMATOLOGICA (BASEL), (1995), vol. 94, no. 1, ISSN 0001-5792, pages 10 - 15, XP008039523 [X] 1-27,32-34 * the whole document * | [X] - KAWAMOTO T ET AL, "Multivalidation analysis of the risk factors for ischemic heart disease and cerebral infarction", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF GERIATRICS 1985 JAPAN, (1985), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 550 - 557, XP008037847 [X] 1-27,32-34 * abstract * | [A] - WESTMAN A ET AL, "Matrix-assisted laser desorption/ionization time-of-flight mass spectrometry analysis of proteins in human cerebrospinal fluid", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, (1998), vol. 12, no. 16, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 1092 - 1098, XP008039616 [A] 1-27,32-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0231(19980831)12:16<1092::AID-RCM286>3.0.CO;2-N | Examination | WO9600903 | WO0171360 |