19.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
13.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
04.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
05.06.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
22.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
27.06.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
12.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.02.2008 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
03.11.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
29.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
14.04.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
15.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|