Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7701101 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2010 | B2 | US2007040465 | 22.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB03760 | 02.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4634383B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2011 | B2 | JP2007504798 | 01.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB03760 | 02.09.2004 | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1661232 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | B1 | EP1661232 | 31.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB03760 | 02.09.2004 | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004015477D1 | 11.09.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB03760 | 02.09.2004 | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005022725 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE403256T | 15.08.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100566091C | 02.12.2009 | C | CN1846341 | 11.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0320559D0 | 01.10.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0320559 | 02.09.2003 |