EP1665871 - AUDIO APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Transducers Limited Cygnet House Kingfisher Way Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZIMA, Henry New Transducers Ltd, Cygnet House Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | 02 /
HILL, Nicholas Patrick Roland New Transducers Ltd Cygnet House,Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke B.Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | 03 /
CROSS, Robin Christopher New Transducers Ltd Cygnet House,Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke B.Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | 04 /
WHITWELL, Timothy Christopher New Transducers Ltd Cygnet House,Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke B.Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | 05 /
VAN DER LINDE, Johan Frank New Transducers Ltd Cygnet House,Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke B.Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | [2006/33] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
AZIMA, Henry New Transducers Ltd, Cygnet House Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | ||
02 /
HILL, Nicholas Patrick Roland New Transducers Ltd Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | |||
03 /
CROSS, Robin Christopher New Transducers Ltd Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | |||
04 /
WHITWELL, Timothy Christopher New Transducers Ltd Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | |||
05 /
VAN DER LINDE, Johan Frank New Transducers Ltd Kingfisher Way, Hinchingbrooke Business Park Huntingdon, Cambs PE29 6FW / GB | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768410.5 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004GB03863 | Priority number, date | GB20030021617 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0321617 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005025267 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665871 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1665871 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04R1/10 (KR);
H04R1/1075 (EP,US);
H04R1/1008 (EP,US);
H04R1/105 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H04R2460/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/33] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOVORRICHTUNG | [2006/23] | English: | AUDIO APPARATUS | [2006/23] | French: | APPAREIL AUDITIF | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 26.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0230151 (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1,12 * page 2, line 16 - line 23 * * page 4, line 6 - line 12; figure 6 *; | [DA]JP2001320790 ; | [DA]JPS5689200 ; | [A]EP0351461 (SCHREIBER SIMEON B) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 18; figures 5,5a *; | [A]JPS59139786 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001320790 A 20011116 (TEMUKO JAPAN:KK) [DA] 1,12 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811014), vol. 0051, no. 59, Database accession no. (E - 077), & JP56089200 A 19810720 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841207), vol. 0082, no. 68, Database accession no. (E - 283), & JP59139786 A 19840810 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |