EP1664025 - PYRROL DERIVATIVES WITH ANTIBACTERIAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREEZE, Alexander Louis, AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
GREEN, Oluyinka Morenike, AstraZeneca R & D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 03 /
HULL, Kenneth Gregory, AstraZeneca R & D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 04 /
NI, Haihong, AstraZeneca R & D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 05 /
HAUCK, Sheila Irene, AstraZeneca R & D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 06 /
MULLEN, George Byron, AstraZeneca R & D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | 07 /
HALES, Neil James, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 08 /
TIMMS, David, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2006/23] | Application number, filing date | 04768421.2 | 10.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004GB03874 | Priority number, date | GB20030021509 | 13.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0321509 | GB20040010527 | 12.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0410527 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026149 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664025 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664025 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D409/14, A61K31/454, A61P31/04 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 13.04.2006 | HR | 13.04.2006 | LT | 13.04.2006 | LV | 13.04.2006 | MK | 13.04.2006 | Title | German: | PYRROLDERIVATE MIT ANTIBAKTERIELLER WIRKUNG | [2006/23] | English: | PYRROL DERIVATIVES WITH ANTIBACTERIAL ACTIVITY | [2006/23] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRROL A ACTIVITE ANTIBACTERIENNE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | BE | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | CZ | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | EE | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | PL | 19.09.2007 | RO | 19.09.2007 | SI | 19.09.2007 | SK | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | BG | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | HU | 20.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
HU | 20.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0894805 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL INC [FR]) [A] 1-26* page 13, line 40 - line 43; claim 1 *; | [A]WO02085886 (DE SOUZA NOEL J [IN], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 15; claim 1 * |