EP1664442 - ROAD SAFETY BARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill & Smith Holdings plc Westhaven House Arleston Way Shirley Solihull West Midlands B90 4LH / GB | [2016/12] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Hill & Smith Holdings plc 2 Highland Court, Cranmore Avenue, Shirley Solihull B90 4LE / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Hill & Smith Holdings plc 2 Highland Court, Cranmore Avenue, Shirley Solihull B90 4LE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARP, Graham T., @c/o Hill & Smith Limited Springvale Business & Industrial Park Bilston Wolverhampton, West Midlands WV14 0QL / GB | 02 /
BILLINGHAM, Sean 5 Croftwood Road Wollescote, West Midlands DY9 7EU / GB | 03 /
WALTON, John, M. "Park House", 101 Park Drive Sprotborough Doncaster, South Yorkshire DN5 7LP / GB | [2016/03] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
SHARP, Graham T., c/o Hill & Smith Limited Springvale Business & Industrial Park, Bilston Wolverhampton, West Midlands WV14 0QL / GB | ||
02 /
BILLINGHAM, Sean 5 Croftwood Road Wollescote, West Midlands DY9 7EU / GB | |||
03 /
WALTON, John, M. "Park House", 101 Park Drive, Sprotborough Doncaster, South Yorkshire DN5 7LP / GB | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2016/03] |
Former [2006/23] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768504.5 | 16.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004GB03958 | Priority number, date | GB20030021757 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0321757 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026445 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664442 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664442 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1664442 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01F13/00, E01F15/02, E01F15/06 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
E01F15/06 (EP,US);
E01F13/00 (US);
E01F15/02 (US);
E01F15/0461 (EP,US);
E04H17/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | E01F15/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRASSENLEITPLANKEN | [2006/23] | English: | ROAD SAFETY BARRIERS | [2006/23] | French: | GLISSIERES DE SECURITE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 06.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | LU | 16.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/42] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | IT | 20.01.2016 | |
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | IT | 20.01.2016 | |
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | NL | 20.01.2016 | |
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]BE657233 (TREFILERIES LEON BEKAERT PVBA) [X] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 6 - line 11 * * page 3, line 18 - line 27 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XYI]GB191420178 (MUEHLEISEN GOTTLIEB [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 34 - line 43 * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 3-5,13,14 [I] 15,16; | [DY]EP0369659 (BRITISH ROPES LTD [GB]) [DY] 3-5,13,14* the whole document * | Examination | DE1784768 | by applicant | EP0369659 |