EP1664376 - APPARATUS FOR CONVEYING GASES TO AND FROM A CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Limited Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB | [2009/33] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Edwards Limited Manor Royal Crawley West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZERNIAK, Michael BOC Edwards, Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 2LW / GB | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Edwards Limited Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 2LW / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Booth, Andrew Steven, et al Edwards Limited Manor Royal Crawley West Sussex RH10 2LW / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Rawlins, Kate Cecilia, et al The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU2 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768664.7 | 24.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004GB04121 | Priority number, date | GB20030022602 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0322602 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005031032 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1664376 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664376 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C23C16/45544 (EP,US);
C23C16/44 (KR);
C23C16/455 (KR);
Y10T137/85986 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86163 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87249 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON GASEN IN EINE KAMMER UND AUS EINER KAMMER | [2006/23] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CONVEYING GASES TO AND FROM A CHAMBER | [2006/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT DE GAZ DANS UNE CHAMBRE ET HORS DE LA CHAMBRE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | BE | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | PL | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | IE | 24.09.2009 | LU | 24.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GB | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.09.2009 | ||
LU | 24.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.09.2009 | ||
LU | 24.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GB | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5250323 (MIYAZAKI SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]EP0651432 (KYOHARA MASAKO [JP]) [A] 1-26 * page 4, columns 45-51 * * page 5, lines 13-30 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO03033762 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10,13,14,16-18,20,22,23,26 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO03087429 (LEE JUNG JOONG [KR], et al) [PA] 1-26 * page 8, lines 15-27 * * page 14; figure 2; table 2 * |