EP1680641 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIFLUX LIMITED Unit C1, Heathrow Corporate Park Green Lane Hounslow, Middlessex TW4 6ER / GB | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESANT, Tanzi 1 Bedford Close London W4 2UE / GB | 02 /
COPLIN, John Cramond, Eaton Bank, Duffield Derby DE56 4BH / GB | 03 /
DEMARGNE, Albert 21 Princes Road, Kew Richmond Surrey TW9 3HP / GB | 04 /
PRATT, Arnold James Stuart Marsh Cottage, Heage Lane Etwall, Derbyshire DE65 6LS / GB | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
BESANT, Tanzi 1 Bedford Close London W4 2UE / GB | ||
02 /
COPLIN, John Cramond, Eaton Bank, Duffield Derby DE56 4BH / GB | |||
03 /
DEMARGNE, Albert 22A Burlington Avenue, Kew, Richmond Surrey TW9 4DQ / GB | |||
04 /
PRATT, Arnold James Stuart Marsh Cottage, Heage Lane Etwall, Derbyshire DE65 6LS / GB | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/29] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768707.4 | 30.09.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004GB04164 | Priority number, date | GB20030023093 | 02.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0323093 | GB20040011148 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0411148 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033607 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680641 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1680641 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/02, F28D9/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
F28D9/005 (EP,US);
F28F3/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2006/29] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER AND USE THEREOF | [2006/29] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET UTILISATION DUDIT ECHANGEUR | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.06.2007 | CY | 27.06.2007 | CZ | 27.06.2007 | DK | 27.06.2007 | EE | 27.06.2007 | FI | 27.06.2007 | PL | 27.06.2007 | RO | 27.06.2007 | SI | 27.06.2007 | SK | 27.06.2007 | TR | 27.06.2007 | BG | 27.09.2007 | GR | 28.09.2007 | LU | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | ES | 08.10.2007 | PT | 27.11.2007 | HU | 28.12.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
LU | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
HU | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
PL | 27.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2292945 (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,9-15,18,22-25,29-33,35,37,38,40,48 * abstract *; | [X]GB2000268 (ASS ENG LTD) [X] 1,8,10-12,14,15,17-19,21-25,27,29,34,37,40,47 * page 2, line 59 - line 93; figure - *; | [X]GB1538653 (CRANE NEDERLAND) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10-12,14-18,20,23-25,29-31,34,47* the whole document *; | [X]US2003056943 (DESSIATOUN SERGUEI VASSILIEVIC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,10-12,14-18,25,26,29-31,33,37,40,44,45,48 * page 2, line 32; figure -; claims 32,33 * | by applicant | US2812618 | GB2122738 | US4771826 | EP0714500 | US5845399 | US6305079 | DE10025486 |