EP1687444 - USING NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3437 / US | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Acolyte Biomedica Limited Enterprise House, Cherry Orchard Lane Salisbury, Wiltshire SP2 7LD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'HARA, Stephen, Acolyte Biomedica Limited Enterprise House, Cherry Orchard Lane Salisbury, Wiltshire SP2 7LD / GB | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Elsy, David Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2009/40] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04769007.8 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004GB04494 | Priority number, date | GB20030024650 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0324650 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042778 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687444 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN FÜR TESTS IN DER KLINISCHEN MIKROBIOLOGIE | [2006/32] | English: | USING NUCLEIC ACIDS FOR CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY TESTING | [2006/32] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES POUR ESSAIS CLINIQUES MICROBIOLOGIQUES | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03035905 (UNIV AIX MARSEILLE II [FR], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * page 6 - page 7 * * page 11 * * page 13, paragraph 1 * [Y] 11; | [Y]WO9937799 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [Y] 11 * page 5, paragraph L *; | [A]WO9514105 (AQUACULTURE DIAGNOSTICS LIMITE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0036142 (VISIBLE GENETICS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3; claim - * * page 15 *; | [A]WO9937804 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1; examples 1,3 *; | [PX]WO2004090089 (ACOLYTE BIOMEDICA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-15 * page 13 * * page 15, lines 8-11 * | [XY] - JOU N-T ET AL, "SINGLE-TUBE, NESTED, REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE PCR FOR DETECTION OF VIABLE MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199705), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1161 - 1165, XP002069482 [X] 1-6,8,10,12-15 * page 1163, column R; figure 3 * [Y] 11 | [XY] - COOK M ET AL, "A SENSITIVE NESTED REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE PCR ASSAY TO DETECT VIABLE CELLS OF THE FISH PATHOGEN RENIBACTERIUM SALMONINARUM IN ATLANTIC SALMON (SALMO SALAR L.)", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (199907), vol. 65, no. 7, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3042 - 3047, XP002908872 [X] 1-6,8,10,12-15 * page 3042 * * page 3043, column R - page 3044 * [Y] 11 | [XY] - VLIET VAN DER G M E ET AL, "ASSESSMENT OF MYCOBACTERIAL VIABILITY BY RNA AMPLIFICATION", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199409), vol. 38, no. 9, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1959 - 1965, XP000601921 [X] 1-6,8-10,12-15 * page 1961, column L * * page 1959, column L; figure 2 * [Y] 11 | by applicant | WO03035905 | - JOU ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1161 - 1165 | - COOK ET AL., AM. SOC. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, no. 7, pages 3042 - 3047 | - VAN DER VLIET ET AL., ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1994), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 1959 - 1965 |