EP1680722 - DETECTION OF ITEMS STORED IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VocalComm Group, LLC 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states VocalComm Group, LLC 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | ||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Qinetiq Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKS, Richard M. Qinetiq Ltd. Marven Techn. Cntr Bldg: P Room: C211, St. Andrews Road, Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/35] | Mills, Julia, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Williams, Arthur Wyn Spencer, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | ||
Former [2006/29] | Williams, Arthur Wyn Spencer QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property, Cody Technology Park, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04769017.7 | 25.10.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004GB04510 | Priority number, date | GB20030025767 | 05.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0325767 | GB20040012917 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0412917 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052767 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680722 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON IN EINEM COMPUTERSYSTEM GESPEICHERTEN ARTIKELN | [2006/29] | English: | DETECTION OF ITEMS STORED IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2006/29] | French: | DETECTION D'ELEMENTS STOCKES DANS UN SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003023865 (COWIE NEIL ANDREW [GB], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US5440723 (ARNOLD WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 3,4,13,14,23,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 26 - line 29 * * column 2, line 51 - line 65 * * column 5, line 44 - line 45 * * column 6, line 46 - line 47 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 1 *; | [A]WO9830957 (SYMANTEC CORP [US]); | [A]GB2383444 (GFI SOFTWARE LTD [CY]) |