EP1682418 - DISPENSING PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2011/29] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, Georgia 30067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINS, Zoe, Claire 85 St Francis Road, Keynsham Bristol BS31 2EA / GB | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Grättinger, Günter Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04769028.4 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004GB04526 | Priority number, date | GB20030026435 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0326435 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051781 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682418 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682418 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/72, B65D71/36 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65D5/725 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00401 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0058 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00728 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABEVERPACKUNG | [2006/30] | English: | DISPENSING PACKAGE | [2006/30] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE DISTRIBUTION | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 05.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | BE | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | HU | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | LU | 27.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 20.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1915341 (WALKER WALTER H, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5878947 (HOY RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 6,7 * | by applicant | US1915341 | US5878947 | EP1539607 |