EP1668005 - ACYLOXYMETHYLCARBAMATE PRODRUGS OF OXAZOLIDINONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSYULA, Vara Prasad Venkata Nagendra 3302 Woodhill Circle Superior Township Michigan 48198 / US | 02 /
GADWOOD, Robert C. 5232 Stonehenge Drive Portage Michigan 49024 / US | 03 /
THOMASCO, Lisa Marie Pfizer Global Research&Develop. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 04 /
KIM, Ji-Young Pfizer Global Research&Develop. 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor 48105 / US | 05 /
CHOY, Allison Laura Pfizer Global Research&Develop. 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor 48105 / US | 06 /
BOYER, Frederick Earl Jr. Pfizer Global Research&Develop. 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor 48105 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Lane, Graham Mark Hamilton Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Lane, Graham Mark Hamilton Pfizer Limited, European Pharma Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04769372.6 | 13.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004IB02983 | Priority number, date | US20030505329P | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 505329 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005028473 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668005 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668005 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, C07D413/14 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACYLOXYMETHYLCARBAMAT-PRODRUGS VON OXAZOLIDINONEN | [2006/24] | English: | ACYLOXYMETHYLCARBAMATE PRODRUGS OF OXAZOLIDINONES | [2006/24] | French: | BIOPRECURSEURS ACYLOXYMETHYLCARBAMATE DES OXAZOLIDINONES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | CZ | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | EE | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | PL | 14.02.2007 | PT | 14.02.2007 | RO | 14.02.2007 | SI | 14.02.2007 | SK | 14.02.2007 | TR | 14.02.2007 | BG | 14.05.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | HU | 15.08.2007 | LU | 13.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/46] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PT | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
TR | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
HU | 15.08.2007 | ||
LU | 13.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
TR | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
HU | 15.08.2007 | ||
LU | 13.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
HU | 15.08.2007 | ||
LU | 13.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 14.05.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0032599 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]WO0146185 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * claims 1-37 *; | [Y]WO02081469 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-30 * claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO02080841 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-30* claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO03062231 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * claims 1-42 *; | [PA]WO2004002967 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-30 * claims 1-44 * |