EP1824646 - DOOR OPENER ARRANGEMENT FOR USE WITH AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AS Bergerveien 12 1396 Billingstad / NO | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYNE, Gisle Knappholen 4 4340 BRYNE / NO | 02 /
ANFINDSEN, Ole, Arnt Gravarsveien 47 N-4306 Sandnes / NO | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
BRYNE, Gisle 2-52-17 Sangenjaya Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 154-0024 / JP | ||
02 /
ANFINDSEN, Ole, Arnt Gravarsveien 47 N-4306 Sandnes / NO | Representative(s) | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2007/35] | Dahlstrand, Björn Legal Affairs & Compliance/Intellectual Property ABB AB Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 04769519.2 | 30.09.2004 | [2007/35] | WO2004IB03177 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035259 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824646 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824646 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J9/16, B05B13/02, B05B12/14, B62D65/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B05B13/0292 (EP,US);
B05B13/0452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRÖFFNUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM INDUSTRIEROBOTER | [2007/35] | English: | DOOR OPENER ARRANGEMENT FOR USE WITH AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [2007/35] | French: | MECANISME OUVRE-PORTE UTILISE AVEC UN ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | GB | 30.09.2010 | IE | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | LU | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
LU | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
LU | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
GB | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
IE | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP3092433B ; | [X]US5014644 (YAMAMOTO TORU [JP], et al); | [X]DE4214863 (KUKA SCHWEISSANLAGEN & ROBOTER [DE]); | [A]US5286160 (AKEEL HADI A [US], et al); | [X]US5941679 (FOTI ROBERT CHARLES [US], et al); | by applicant | US4498414 | US4988260 | JPH07232110 | JPH10235591 |