EP1668633 - OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER RECORDING METHOD, OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/41] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ROMPAEY, Bart c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KUIJPER, Maarten c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04769975.6 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004IB51727 | Priority number, date | EP20030103470 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03103470 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005029472 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668633 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668633 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045, G11B7/007 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G11B7/00456 (EP,NO,US);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B7/00736 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN OPTISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER, OPTISCHER AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER UND VORICHTUNG ZUM SCHREIBEN VON INFORMATIONEN | [2006/24] | English: | OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER RECORDING METHOD, OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING INFORMATION | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE ET APPAREIL POUR ECRIRE DES INFORMATIONS | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | PL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | PT | 08.03.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/43] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 08.10.2008 | |
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1233409 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,10-12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063]; figure 3 *[A] 2,3,8,9,13 | by applicant | EP1233409 |