EP1685747 - DYNAMICALLY ILLUMINATED PRODUCT DISPLAY SYSTEM APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARMAROPOULOS, George P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
MAMA, Jack Kyrialkos P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 03 /
VAN HEERDEN, Clive Read P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 04 /
WAGNER, Philippa Clare P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04770156.0 | 01.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004IB51953 | Priority number, date | US20030508718P | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 508718 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034585 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685747 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, A45C15/06 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G09F13/22 (EP,US);
A47B96/00 (KR);
A45C15/06 (EP,US);
A47F11/06 (KR);
B65D31/16 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCH BELEUCHTETES PODUKT-DISPLAY-SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2006/31] | English: | DYNAMICALLY ILLUMINATED PRODUCT DISPLAY SYSTEM APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2006/31] | French: | PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET SYSTEME DE PRESENTATION DE PRODUITS A ECLAIRAGE DYNAMIQUE | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 30.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003048635 (KNOERZER ANTHONY ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-25* paragraphs [0025] - [0040]; figures 1,4; claims 1-14 * |