EP1686883 - A BASKET FOR DISHWASHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti uzeri, Tuzla Istanbul, 34950 / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTUJI, Cem, @Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ALTUN, Umit, @Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2012/48] |
Former [2006/32] | 01 /
BASTUJI, Cem, Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | ||
02 /
ALTUN, Umit, Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/32] | Berkkam, Ayfer Ankara Patent Bureau Limited, Bestekar Sokak No. 10, Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 04770326.9 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004IB52213 | Priority number, date | TR20030001865 | 30.10.2003 Original published format: TR 200301865 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005041744 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686883 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686883 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A47L15/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | KORB FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2006/32] | English: | A BASKET FOR DISHWASHERS | [2006/32] | French: | PANIER POUR LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2004 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/25] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 28.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5431294 (STOTTMANN RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]DE29608871U (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2139224 (BOSCH HAUSGERAETE GMBH) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 14 *; | [AD]EP0186157 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1072221 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001178670 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001178670 A 20010703 (RINNAI CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |