EP1683081 - DATA CARRIER OR DOCUMENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/30] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SICKERT, Klaus c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
DREWS, Steffen c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/31] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/10] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/30] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04770330.1 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004IB52221 | Priority number, date | EP20030104103 | 06.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03104103 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005045754 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683081 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683081 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H05K1/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
G06K19/025 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07783 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER ODER DOKUMENTTRÄGER | [2006/30] | English: | DATA CARRIER OR DOCUMENT CARRIER | [2006/30] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNEES OU SUPPORT DE DOCUMENTS | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HU | 26.10.2011 | IT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | LU | 27.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE19721057 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-7 * paragraphs [005A] , [005B] * * column 1, line 3 - line 16 * * column 2, lines 19-45 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 1 *; | [XA]US2002047776 (HART CORNELIS MARIA [NL], et al) [X] 4-7 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [X]EP1291818 (DATAMARS SA [CH]) [X] 1-7* abstract * |