EP1660968 - DATA CONVERSION METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speedark Ltd. 99 Hahostadrut St. 31250 Haifa / IL | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNIN, Haim 54 Shoshanat Hacarmel 34322 Haifa / IL | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04770429.1 | 18.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004IL00757 | Priority number, date | US20030496326P | 18.08.2003 Original published format: US 496326 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017643 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660968 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H03M1/06 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H03M1/06 (EP,KR,US);
H03M1/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/29] | H03M1/06 | ||
Former IPC [2006/22] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENUMSETZUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME | [2006/22] | English: | DATA CONVERSION METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2006/22] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE CONVERSION DE DONNEES | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2010 | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5410750 (CANTWELL ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1,13,26,39 * figures 2,4 *; | [XY]US5612978 (BLANCHARD SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 5,6 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10,11; | [X]US6492903 (RANON PETER M [US]) [X] 12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO02101953 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [Y] 5-7,9-11 * figures 3,4,7a *; | [X]WO03036892 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 9 * abstract *; | [A]US2003087622 (JAYARAMAN SRIKANT [US], et al) [A] 1-40* figures 2,4 *; | [XY] - K.HUANG ET AL, "Technique for alleviating dynamica-Range requirements for wideband software radio receiver", SDR, california, (2002), XP002461636 [X] 1-4,6,13-17,26-30,39,40 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,9-11 | [DY] - GERT CAUWENBERGHS ET AL, "Adaptive Digital Correction of Analog Errors in MASH ADC's-Part I: Off-Line and BlindOn-Line Calibration", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200007), vol. 47, no. 7, ISSN 1057-7130, XP011013248 [DY] 7 * abstract * | [DX] - PÉTER KISS ET AL, "Adaptive Digital Correction of Analog Errors in MASH ADC's-Part II: Correction Using Test-Signal Injection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200007), vol. 47, no. 7, ISSN 1057-7130, XP011013253 [DX] 1,13,26,39 * the whole document * | [XY] - BROOKS T L ET AL, "A CASCADED SIGMA-DELTA PIPELINE A/D CONVERTER WITH 1.25 MHZ SIGNAL BANDWIDTH AND 89 DB SNR", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199712), vol. 32, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1896 - 1906, XP000767440 [X] 1,13,26,39 * figure 4 * [Y] 6,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.643648 | [A] - CROCHIERE R E ET AL, "MULTIRATE TECHNIQUES IN FILTER BANKS AND SPECTRUM ANALYZERS AND SYNTHESIZERS", MULTIRATE DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1983), pages 289 - 400, XP002031492 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003202460 (JUNG KI-HO [KR], et al) | Examination | US2003091207 |