EP1670516 - WATER SOLUBLE NANOPARTICLES INCLUSION COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solubest Ltd. Tamar Science Park, Prof. H. Pekeris Street 4, Suite 21 76702 Rehorot / IL | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDSHTEIN, Rina 157 Shani Street 90411 Har Hebron / IL | 02 /
KAMBURG, Roman 9 Lubman Street 75315 Rishon Lezion / IL | 03 /
RATNER, Galina 1 Yigal Yadin Street 76519 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
KOPYLOV, Michael 10/22 David Frishman Street 84253 Beer Sheva / IL | 05 /
ZELKIND, Ilya 177/3 Ben Gurion Street 87540 Ofakim / IL | 06 /
GOLDSHTEIN, Vadim 157 Shani Street 90411 Har Hebron / IL | 07 /
SKYLARSKY, Olga 25 Hatechia Street 76551 Rehovot / IL | 08 /
TULBOVICH, Boris 6/24 Hanoar Haoved Street 75781 Ashkelon / IL | 09 /
STERN, Erwin c/o SoluBest Ltd., 18, Einstein Street Ness Ziona 74140 / IL | [2007/19] |
Former [2006/25] | 01 /
GOLDSHTEIN, Rina 157 Shani Street 90411 Har Hebron / IL | ||
02 /
KAMBURG, Roman 9 Lubman Street 75315 Rishon Lezion / IL | |||
03 /
RATNER, Galina 1 Yigal Yadin Street 76519 Rehovot / IL | |||
04 /
KOPYLOV, Michael 10/22 David Frishman Street 84253 Beer Sheva / IL | |||
05 /
ZELKIND, Ilya 177/3 Ben Gurion Street 87540 Ofakim / IL | |||
06 /
GOLDSHTEIN, Vadim 157 Shani Street 90411 Har Hebron / IL | |||
07 /
SKYLARSKY, Olga 25 Hatechia Street 76551 Rehovot / IL | |||
08 /
TULBOVICH, Boris 6/24 Hanoar Haoved Street 75781 Ashkelon / IL | |||
09 /
STERN, Erwin 12 Bialik Street 43610 Raanana / IL | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04770581.9 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004IL00910 | Priority number, date | US20030507623P | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 507623 P | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005030257 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1670516 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A01N43/653, A01N25/04, A61P31/04, A61P25/28, A61P31/10, A61P5/32, A61P35/00 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K47/6933 (EP);
A61K47/6939 (EP);
A61K47/6949 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSSLICHE NANOPARTIKELEINSCHLUSSKOMPLEXE | [2006/25] | English: | WATER SOLUBLE NANOPARTICLES INCLUSION COMPLEXES | [2006/25] | French: | NANOPARTICULES HYDROSOLUBLES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 29.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03028700 (SOLUBEST LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,22-25 * examples 3-6,8 * * claim - * * table 3 *; | [DX]US2003129239 (GOLDSHTEIN RINA [IL]) [DX] 1,22-25; | [X]EP1127570 (NANOCARRIER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,22-25 * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]WO9704756 (NANOSYSTEMS LLC [US]) [Y] 1,22-25 * example - * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0609968 (FIDIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-5,21-26 * example 26B *; | [Y]WO9722335 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 1,22-25 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO03032922 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [Y] 1-5,21-26 * example 4 *; | [E]WO2004085712 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1-5,21-26 * claim - *; | [PY]WO03095498 (LIU YUNQING [CN], et al) [PY] 1-5,21-26 * example 4 *; | [L]EP1514877 (LIU YUNQING [CN], et al) [L] 1-5,21-26 * L: translation * | [X] - KAZUNARI AKIYOSHI ET AL, "HYDROGEL NANOPARTICLE FORMED BY SELF-ASSEMBLY OF HYDROPHOBIZED POLYSACCHARIDE. STABILIZATION OF ADRIAMYCIN BY COMPLEXATION", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960801), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 286 - 290, XP000620050 [X] 1,22-25 * page 286, column R, paragraph MATERIALS * * figure 1 * * table 1 * * figures 4-6 * | [Y] - PAVANETTO F ET AL, "EVALUATION OF PROCESS PARAMETERS INVOLVED IN CHITOSAN MICROSPHERE PREPARATION BY THE O/W/O MULTIPLE EMULSION METHOD", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS INC. LONDON, GB, (19961101), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 679 - 688, XP000632686 [Y] 1,22-25 * page 680 - page 682; figure 1 * | [X] - ROLLAND A ET AL, "NEW MACROMOLECULAR CARRIERS FOR DRUGS. ÖI. PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF POLY (OXYETHYLENE-B-ISOPRENE-B-OXYETHYLENE) BLOCK COPOLYMER AGGREGATES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. NEW YORK, US, (19920305), vol. 44, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 1195 - 1203, XP000276254 [X] 1,22-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1992.070440709 | [X] - ZHANG QIANG ET AL, "Increase in gentamicin uptake by cultured mouse peritoneal macrophages and rat hepatocytes by its binding to polybutylcyanoacrylate nanoparticles", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980413), vol. 164, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 21 - 27, XP002248300 [X] 1,22-25 * abstract * * page 23 - page 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(97)00395-5 | [Y] - MASAYUKI YOKOYAMA ET AL, "TOXICITY AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY AGAINST SOLID TUMORS OF MICELLE-FORMING POLYMERIC ANTICANCER DRUG AND ITS EXTREMELY LONG CIRCULATION IN BLOOD", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (1991), vol. 51, no. 12, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3229 - 3236, XP000887124 [Y] 1,22-25 * abstract * | [Y] - JONES M-C ET AL, "Polymeric micelles - a new generation of colloidal drug carriers", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990901), vol. 48, no. 2, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 101 - 111, XP004257101 [Y] 1,22-25 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(99)00039-9 | [Y] - ZGOULLI S ET AL, "MICROENCAPSULATION OF ERYTHROMYCIN AND CLARITHROMYCIN USING A SPRAY-DRYING TECHNIQUE", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS INC. LONDON, GB, (199909), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 565 - 571, XP000834849 [Y] 1,22-25 * page 566 - page 567 * * page 569; table 1 * * page 570 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/026520499288762 | [PY] - FERREIRA ALMEIDA P ET AL, "Cross-linked alginate-gelatine beads: a new matrix for controlled release of pindolol", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040707), vol. 97, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 431 - 439, XP004519507 [PY] 1,22-25 * abstract * * figures 2,5-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.03.015 | [Y] - GUPTA P K ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo evaluation of clarithromycin/poly(lactic acid) microspheres for intramuscular drug delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE 1993 NETHERLANDS, (1993), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 229 - 238, XP002323041 [Y] 1,22-25 * table 1 * * page 235, column R, paragraph L - page 237 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(93)90190-G |