EP1735327 - AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHLORINATED SUCROSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V.B. MEDICARE PVT. LTD. Pharmed Gardens Whitefield Road Bangalore 560 048 KRN / IN | [2009/22] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Pharmed Medicare Private Limited Pharmed Gardens Whitefield Road Bangalore 560 048, Karnataka / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATNAM, Rakesh c/o Pharmed Medicare Private Ltd. Pharmed House, 141 Walchand Hirachand Marg Mumbai, Maharashtra, 400 001 / IN | 02 /
KULKARNI, Shrikant c/o Pharmed Medicare Priv. Ltd. Pharmed House, 141 Walchand Hirachand Marg Mumbai, Maharashtra, 400 001 / IN | 03 /
AURORA, Suneet c/o Pharmed Medicare Private Ltd. Pharmed House, 141 Walchand Hirachand Marg Mumbai, Maharashtra, 400 001 / IN | [2008/24] |
Former [2006/52] | 01 /
RATNAM, Rakesh 74/F, Venus, Worli Sea Face Mumbai 400 018, Maharashtra / IN | ||
02 /
KULKARNI, Shrikant 74/F, Venus, Worli Sea Face Mumbai 400 018, Maharashtra / IN | |||
03 /
AURORA, Suneet 74/F, Venus, Worli Sea Face Mumbai 400 018, Maharashtra / IN | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04770659.3 | 20.05.2004 | [2006/52] | WO2004IN00142 | Priority number, date | WO2004IN00064 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: PCT/IN2004/000064 | IN2004MUM0563 | 17.05.2004 Original published format: IN MU05632004 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090374 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735327 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735327 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/06, C07H5/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
C07H1/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07H5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07H3/00 (KR);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLORIERTER SACCHAROSE | [2006/52] | English: | AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CHLORINATED SUCROSE | [2006/52] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SACCHAROSE CHLORE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2011 | BE | 04.05.2011 | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | DK | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HU | 04.05.2011 | IT | 04.05.2011 | NL | 04.05.2011 | PL | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SE | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | IE | 20.05.2011 | LU | 20.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | FR | 04.07.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | GB | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | ES | 15.08.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | DE | 01.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
DE | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
DE | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GB | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
GB | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
GB | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 04.07.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 05.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AX]US4380476 (MUFTI KHIZAR S [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *[X] 24,25; | [AX]US5498709 (NAVIA JUAN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * [X] 24,25; | [AX] - FAIRCLOUGH P H ET AL, "DERIVATIVES OF BETA-D-FRUCTOFURANOSYL ALPHA-D-GALACTO-PYRANOSIDE", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19750401), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 285 - 298, XP000571304 [A] 1 * the whole document * [X] 24,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)82610-5 | by applicant | US4380476 | US5498706 |