EP1644499 - siRNA EXPRESSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI ROMA "LA SAPIENZA" Piazzale Aldo Moro 5 00185 Roma / IT | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOZZONI, Irene, c/o Università degli Studi di Roma La Sapienza, Piazzale A. Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | 02 /
DENTI, Michela A., c/o Univ. degli Studi di Roma Dip. di Genetica La Sapienza, Piazzale A. Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | 03 /
ROSA, Alessandro, c/o Univ. degli Studi di Roma Dip. di Genetica La Sapienza Piazzale A.Moro, 5. I-00185 Roma / IT | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/15] | 01 /
BOZZONI, Irene, c/o Università degli Studi di Roma La Sapienza, Piazzale A. Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | ||
02 /
DENTI, Michela A., c/o Univ. degli Studi di Roma La Sapienza, Piazzale A. Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | |||
03 /
ROSA, Alessandro, c/o Univ. degli Studi di Roma La Sapienza, Piazzale A. Moro, 5 I-00185 Roma / IT | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Capasso, Olga, et al de Simone & Partners SpA Via V.Bellini 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 04770721.1 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004IT00381 | Priority number, date | IT2003RM00335 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: IT RM20030335 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005005634 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1644499 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1644499 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/85, A61K31/713 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N2310/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2330/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSSYSTEM FÜR siRNA | [2006/15] | English: | siRNA EXPRESSION SYSTEM | [2006/15] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION D'ARNsi | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | IE | 09.07.2009 | LU | 09.07.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
LU | 09.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
LU | 09.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 26.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [PX] - DENTI M A ET AL, "A new vector, based on the PolII promoter for the U1 snRNA gene, for the expression of siRNAs in mammalian cells", MOLECULAR THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA,, US, (200407), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 191 - 199, XP004660550 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2004.04.008 | [DA] - SUI GUANGCHAO ET AL, "A DNA vector-based RNAi technology to suppress gene expression in mammalian cells.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 16 APR 2002, (20020416), vol. 99, no. 8, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5515 - 5520, XP002311179 [DA] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.082117599 | [A] - YOUNG DE M B ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERIZATION OF RIBOZYMES EXPRESSED USING U1 AND T7 VECTORS FOR THE INTRACELLULAR CLEAVAGE OF ANF MRNA", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (19941011), vol. 33, no. 40, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 12127 - 12138, XP000647772 [A] 1-8 * page 12136; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00206a016 | [AD] - PAUL C P ET AL, "EFFECTIVE EXPRESSION OF SMALL INTERFERING RNA IN HUMAN CELLS", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (200205), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 505 - 508, XP001121066 [AD] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0502-505 | [PA] - XIA HAIBIN ET AL, "RNAi suppresses polyglutamine-induced neurodegeneration in a model of spinocerebellar ataxia.", NATURE MEDICINE. AUG 2004, (200408), vol. 10, no. 8, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 816 - 820, XP002311180 [PA] 1-8 * page 817 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1076 |