EP1650265 - OXYGEN-ABSORBING BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND PACKAGING MATERIAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI, Yoshihisa, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | 02 /
KODANI, Mie, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 7108622 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Tomoyuki, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 7108622 / JP | 04 /
IWASAKI, Hideharu, c/o KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 7108691 / JP | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Brunetti, Fabrizio, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2011/47] |
Former [2009/52] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 158 rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04770866.4 | 22.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004JP10402 | Priority number, date | JP20030279029 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003279029 | [2006/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005010101 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650265 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08K5/3415, B01J20/26 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C08J7/065 (EP,US);
C08K5/3415 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J2220/44 (EP,US);
B65D81/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFFABSORBIERENDER KÖRPER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL DAMIT | [2006/17] | English: | OXYGEN-ABSORBING BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND PACKAGING MATERIAL USING SAME | [2006/17] | French: | CORPS ABSORBANT L'OXYGENE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE CORPS ET MATIERE D'EMBALLAGE UTILISANT CE CORPS | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2006 | Translation filed | 27.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 09.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1032038 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-8* claims 1,3 * | International search | [A]JP2002249174 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO, et al); | [A]JP2002241610 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPH06269662 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPH05156095 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH02173150 (TSUCHIDA HIDETOSHI); | [A]JP2000290312 (DAICEL CHEM) |