EP1638230 - PEAK ELECTRIC POWER SUPPRESSING APPARATUS AND PEAK ELECTRIC POWER SUPPRESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jifeng H608, Huiyuan International Apt. Chaoayang District, Beijin 100101 / CN | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04770944.9 | 26.07.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004JP10633 | Priority number, date | JP20030280553 | 28.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003280553 | [2006/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011168 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638230 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H04L27/2614 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/44] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG DER ELEKTRISCHEN SPITZENLEISTUNG | [2006/12] | English: | PEAK ELECTRIC POWER SUPPRESSING APPARATUS AND PEAK ELECTRIC POWER SUPPRESSING METHOD | [2006/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR SUPPRIMER LES PICS DE PUISSANCE ELECTRIQUE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | Translation filed | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 24.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - WANG, X. ET AL., "Reduction of Peak-to-Avarage Ratio of OFDM System Using Companding Technique", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, (19990903), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 303 - 307, XP002903417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.796272 | [Y] - SAITO, T. ET AL., "OFDM Shingo ni Taisuru Peak Tai Heikin Denryokuhi no Yokusei Hoshiki no Kaihatsu", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS TSUSHIN SOCIETY TAIKAI, (2002), page 274, XP002985636 | [Y] - TAKE, T. ET AL., "Kubun Senkei Henkan o Mochiita OFDM Shingo no PAPR Teigen ni Kansuru Ichikento", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOGO TAIKAI, (2003), page 527, XP002985637 | [AP] - TAKE, T. ET AL., "Kubun Senkei Henkan o Mochiita OFDM Shingo no Taiikigai Fukusha Yokuatsu ni Kansuru Ichikento", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOGO TAIKAI, (2004), page 562, XP002985638 |