EP1655005 - WARMING TOOL IN A SHEET FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAMOTO, Yoshiaki; c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories, 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Masataka; c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories, 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | 03 /
KAWAJIRI, Hironobu;2c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories, 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | 04 /
NISHIGUCHI, Hisao; c/o Kao Corporation, 14-10, Nih onbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2006/29] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
KUMAMOTO, Yoshiaki; c/o Kao Corporation, Research 2606,Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi;3213497 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIKAWA, Masataka; c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories, 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi; 3213497 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAJIRI, Hironobu;2c/o Kao Corporation, Research 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-g un, Tochigi; 3213497 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHIGUCHI, Hisao; c/o Kao Corporation, 14-10, Nih onbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Tokyo Tolxo 0103821 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771013.2 | 29.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004JP10800 | Priority number, date | JP20030204966 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003204966 | JP20030206865 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003206865 | JP20030206866 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003206866 | JP20030356907 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003356907 | JP20040031360 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004031360 | JP20040031361 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004031361 | JP20040034169 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004034169 | JP20040034170 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004034170 | [2006/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011543 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655005 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/08 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61F7/034 (EP,US);
F24V30/00 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0062 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/45] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWÄRMUNGSWERKEZUG IN FLÄCHENFORM | [2006/19] | English: | WARMING TOOL IN A SHEET FORM | [2006/19] | French: | OUTIL DE CHAUFFAGE SOUS FORME DE FEUILLE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | Translation filed | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 12.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 17.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2004041135 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-4,10,11 * abstract *; | EP1570821 [ ] (KAO CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]US5318844 (BRANDON RALPH E [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 6 - line 16 *; | [A]WO9322499 (DOMTAR INC [CA]) [A] 1-6 * page 7, line 11 - line 19 *; | [Y]US2001042546 (UMEDA TOMOSHIGE [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087]; figures 4A-B *; | [A]JP7083832B (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-6; | [A]EP1121912 (JAPAN PIONICS [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]EP0370600 (SEIKE TAKASHI) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 5 - page 6 *; | [A]US5975074 (KOISO YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 5 - line 11; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 28 * * column 7, line 45 - column 10, line 58 *; | [A]JP2003102761 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-6,10,11 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] *; | [XY]JP2572621B (KAO CORP) [X] 1-4,10,11 * column 1 - column 6; figures 1-2 * [Y] 3,6 | International search | [X]JPH10263002 (MOTOCHI KENKYUSHO KK); | [Y]JP2572621B ; | [Y]JPH0546702Y ; | [Y]JP2001149401 (HAKUGEN CO LTD); | [A]JP2001198150 (JAPAN PIONICS); | [A]JP2003102761 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2572612B | JP2003102761 |