EP1652852 - NUCLEOSIDE CAPABLE OF RELEASING FUNCTIONAL UNIT THROUGH OXIDATION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLIGONUCLEOTIDE CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Isao 1-21, Kanshuji-shibayama, Yamashina-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 6078242 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Akimitsu 15-1-403, Katsura-shibanoshitacho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158077 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kazuo 56-908, Nishinokyo-higashinakaaicho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6048437 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771129.6 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004JP11039 | Priority number, date | JP20030289972 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003289972 | [2006/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005014610 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652852 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652852 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/173, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68, C12N15/09 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C07H19/173 (EP,US);
C07H19/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6823 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6823, C12Q2525/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOSID, DAS DAZU IN DER LAGE IST, EINE FUNKTIONELLE EINHEIT DURCH OXIDATION FREIZUSETZEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DIESES ENTHALTENDEN OLIGONUKLEOTIDS | [2006/18] | English: | NUCLEOSIDE CAPABLE OF RELEASING FUNCTIONAL UNIT THROUGH OXIDATION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLIGONUCLEOTIDE CONTAINING THE SAME | [2006/18] | French: | NUCLEOSIDE CAPABLE DE LIBERER UNE UNITE FONCTIONNELLE PAR OXYDATION ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE CONTENANT CELUI-CI | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | Translation filed | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03042658 (ACLARA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 89; compounds 2,3 * * figure 62 *; | [X] - W. MARKIEWICZ ET AL, "A new method of synthesis of fluorescently labelled oligonucleotides and their application in DNA sequencing", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3672 - 3680, XP002534310 [X] 1,3,4 * figure 1; compounds 12-17 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.18.3672 | [X] - I. C. GILLIAM ET AL, "Labelling of DNA with a non-Radiaactive Analogue of dGTP", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1989), vol. 8, pages 1453 - 1462, XP009118583 [X] 1 * page 1458; compounds IIIA, IIIB * * page 1459; compounds IVA, IVB * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07328318908048853 | International search | [A]JPS61112077 (PIERREL SPA); | [A]JPH01500353 ; | [A]JP2001270896 (PRO NEURON INC) | [A] - WU X. ET AL., "Synthesis and biological activity of a bivalent nucleotide inhibitor of ribonucleotide reductase.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 20, pages 2387 - 2389, XP004224224 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00481-9 | [A] - OKAMOTO A. ET AL., "Phototriggered drug release from functionalized oligonucleotides by a molecular beacon strategy", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2003), vol. 42, no. 22, pages 2502 - 2504, XP002903499 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200250832 | [A] - MA Z. ET AL., "Nucleic acid-triggered catalytic drug release", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2000), vol. 97, no. 21, pages 11159 - 11163, XP002903500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.21.11159 |