09.10.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
07.11.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.01.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
20.12.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
23.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - English title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
19.08.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.10.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
24.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
14.04.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
07.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|