EP1662078 - RECOGNITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/22] | RECOGNITION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
[2013/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states Asahi Denso Co., Ltd. 1126, Nakajo, Hamakita-shi Shizuoka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asahi Denso Co., Ltd. 1126, Nakajo, Hamakita-shi Shizuoka / JP | |||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asahi Denso Co., Ltd. 1126 Nakajo Hamakita-shi Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIMARU, Junji Kuresuto Koto 201 506-4, Isonokami-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0011 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Toyohiko 297-13, Kosaka Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-0237 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Michiyuki 21-4, Oshima-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3112 / JP | [2014/49] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
ISHIMARU, Junji Kuresuto Koto 201 506-4, Isonokami-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO, Toyohiko 297-13, Kosaka Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-0237 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI, Michiyuki 21-4, Oshima-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3112 / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Brown, Kenneth Richard R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04771214.6 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004JP11179 | Priority number, date | JP20030290775 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003290775 | [2006/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005014959 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662078 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662078 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G07C9/00658 (EP);
G06Q20/206 (EP,US);
G07C9/00182 (EP);
G07F7/02 (EP);
G07G1/0018 (EP);
G07C2009/00793 (EP);
G07C9/00722 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | E05B49/00, E05B19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/07] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/39] | English: | RECOGNITION DEVICE | [2013/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE | [2013/39] |
Former [2006/22] | ERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/22] | RECOGNITION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2006/22] | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2006 | Translation filed | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0744708 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 8* abstract *; | [XY]JP2000331132 (HITACHI MAXELL) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 8; | [X]US6482495 (KOHAMA KYOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 14, line 22 - line 65 * * figures 15,16 * | International search | [A]JPH065480Y ; | [Y]JPH0632645U ; | [A]JPH0629395Y ; | [A]JPH1018659 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [Y]JPH10292687 (UNITEC KK, et al); | [Y]US5905446 (BENORE RANDOLPH C [US], et al); | [A]JP2000352231 (ALPHA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2001295525 (YAZAKI CORP) |