EP1649758 - MASTICATABLE CAPSULE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8384 / JP | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO, Yuzo, Morinaga Milk Industry Co., Ltd. Food R& D Laboratory, 1-83, Higashihara 5-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-8583 / JP | 02 /
OSHIDA, Kyoichi, Morinaga Milk Industry Co., Ltd. Nutritional Sci. Lab., 1-83, Higashihara 5-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-8583 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Takanori Shalome Miyakita 205, 135, Miyakita-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0053 / JP | [2009/42] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
ASANO, Y., Morinaga Milk Industry Co., Ltd. Food R& D Laboratory, 1-83, Higashihara 5-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-8583 / JP | ||
02 /
OSHIDA, K., Morinaga Milk Industry Co., Ltd. Nutritional Sci. Lab., 1-83, Higashihara 5-chome Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-8583 / JP | |||
03 /
KOBAYASHI, Takanori Shalome Miyakita 205, 135, Miyakita-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0053 / JP | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04771300.3 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004JP11286 | Priority number, date | JP20030284072 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003284072 | [2006/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011402 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649758 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649758 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, A23P1/04, A61K9/48, A61K47/10, A61K47/42, A61P19/06 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/4833 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K9/4825 (EP,US);
A61P19/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/21] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUKAPSEL UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/17] | English: | MASTICATABLE CAPSULE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2006/17] | French: | CAPSULE MASTICABLE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2006 | Translation filed | 31.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001122770 ; | [A]JP2002154949 ; | [A]US4428927 (EBERT WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-7* column 4, line 35 - line 42; examples I,IV,V *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 41, Database accession no. 2001-387146, XP002424560 & JP2001122770 A 20010508 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 59, Database accession no. 2002-552773, XP002424561 & JP2002154949 A 20020528 (LION CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0286735 (LION CORP, et al); | [A]JPH10310519 (DAIICHI KASEI, et al); | [A]JPH07264995 (SANKYO CO, et al) |