EP1654511 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keihin Thermal Technology Corporation 480, Inuzuka, 1-chome Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-8678 / JP | [2012/36] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Hirohiko, Showa Denko K.K. Oyama Regional Office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi, Tochigi 3238678 / JP | 02 /
ARINO, Kouta, Showa Denko K.K. Oyama Regional Office, 480, Inuzuka 1-chome Oyama-shi, Tochigi 3238678 / JP | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04771312.8 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004JP11309 | Priority number, date | JP20030284870 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003284870 | US20030497338P | 25.08.2003 Original published format: US 497338 P | JP20040076670 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004076670 | US20040555706P | 24.03.2004 Original published format: US 555706 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012823 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1654511 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/22 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
F28F9/0278 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (KR);
F25B39/00 (KR);
F28D1/04 (KR);
F28D1/053 (KR);
F28D1/05375 (EP,US);
F28D1/05391 (EP,US);
F28F9/0204 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2006/19] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [2006/19] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 18.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5152339 (CALLESON GERALD C [US]) [X] 12-14 * figures 7, 10 * * column 5, line 12 * * column 2, line 57 - line 61 * [Y] 15-21,23,24; | [YDA]JP2003075024 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [YD] 15-20 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0121] * [A] 1-11; | [Y]US6540016 (BALDANTONI ANTONIO [US]) [Y] 21 * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO03033984 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 23,24* page 14, line 1 - line 4 * | International search | [Y]JPS553172U ; | [Y]JPH0989484 (HISAKA WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2003075024 (SHOWA DENKO KK) | Examination | US2003131979 |