EP1652870 - PHOTOCURABLE COMPOSITION AND COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Mitsubishi Building, 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Hitoshi, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co, Inc Tokyo Research Lab., 1-1 Niijyu-ku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 02 /
HAYAKAWA, Junya, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc Tokyo Research Lab., 1-1 Niijyu-ku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 03 /
TAKEUCHI, M., Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc. Tokyo Research Lab., 1-1 Niijyu-ku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 04 /
JONO, Masahiro, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc. Tokyo Research Lab., 1-1 Niijyu-ku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 05 /
ISHII, Kenji, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc. Tokyo Research Lab., 1-1 Niijyu-ku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771505.7 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004JP11520 | Priority number, date | JP20030288288 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003288288 | JP20040029979 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004029979 | [2006/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005014696 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652870 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652870 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/08, C08L81/02, C08K5/54, C09D181/02 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C09D181/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L81/02 (KR);
C08G75/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/45 (EP,US);
Y10S430/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/46] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOHÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/18] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE COMPOSITION AND COATING COMPOSITION | [2006/18] | French: | COMPOSITION PHOTORETICULABLE ET COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2006 | Translation filed | 02.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH09110979 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPH1171521 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001513765 ; | [Y]JP2002047346 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]WO02088220 (ESSILOR INT [FR]); | [AP]JP2003261648 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y] - SUYAMA K ET AL, "Photo- and Thermochemical Behavior of Quaternary Ammonium Thiocyanates and Their Use as Crosslinkers", JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20030715), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 83 - 86, XP002904258 | [Y] - TSUNOOKA M ET AL, "Photocuring Systems Using Quaternary Ammonium Thiocyanates", JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20020327), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 47 - 50, XP002904259 |