EP1655315 - RESIN FOR RESIST, POSITIVE RESIST COMPOSITION, AND METHOD OF FORMING RESIST PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD. 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Ryotaro, @c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 02 /
HADA, Hideo, @c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 03 /
IWAI, Takeshi, @c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Ryotaro, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | ||
02 /
HADA, Hideo, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
03 /
IWAI, Takeshi, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/19] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04771696.4 | 10.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004JP11735 | Priority number, date | JP20030293000 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003293000 | [2006/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016982 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655315 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655315 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, G03F7/039, H01L21/30 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
G03F7/0397 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/1808 (EP,US);
C08F220/281 (KR);
C08F220/282 (KR);
C08F220/283 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/47] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HARZ FÜR RESIST, POSITIVRESISTZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RESISTSTRUKTUR | [2006/19] | English: | RESIN FOR RESIST, POSITIVE RESIST COMPOSITION, AND METHOD OF FORMING RESIST PATTERN | [2006/19] | French: | RESINE POUR RESERVE, COMPOSITION DE RESERVE POSITIVE ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE MOTIF DE RESERVE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2006 | Translation filed | 19.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1452919 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1452918 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1452917 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14* the whole document *; | [E]EP1596251 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1643306 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2003177538 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2003223001 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [XP]JP2003238629 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [XP]JP2003280201 (JSR CORP, et al); | [XP]JP2004176049 (JSR CORP); | [XP]JP2004300403 (JSR CORP) |