EP1661578 - SKIN ULCER PREVENTIVE CURATIVE AGENT CONTAINING HUMAN RECOMBINANT HGF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakamura, Toshikazu 1-4, Hoshojicho, Okazaki, Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8333 / JP | For all designated states Kringle Pharma Inc. 2F Saito Biotechnology Incubator 7-7-15 Saitoasagi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0085 / JP | [2018/11] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Nakamura, Toshikazu 1-4, Hoshojicho, Okazaki, Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8333 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kringle Pharma Inc. 8F Senri Asahi Hankyu Bldg. 5-3, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Toshikazu 1-4, Hoshojicho, Okazaki Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8333 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Saho 5-29, Sakurai 1-chome, Mino-shi Osaka 562-0043 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kunio c/o Kanazawa University Kakuma-machi, Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-1192 / JP | 04 /
ITAMI, Satoshi 37-7, Keyakizaka 3-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0145 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kunihiko 3-14, Higashitokiwadai 9-chome Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-0103 / JP | [2018/10] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Toshikazu 1-4, Hoshojicho, Okazaki, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8333 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHIDA, Saho 5-29, Sakurai 1-chome, Mino-shi Osaka 562-0043 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Kunio 25-2-204, Onoharahigashi 6-chome Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0031 / JP | |||
04 /
ITAMI, Satoshi 37-7, Keyakizaka 3-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0145 / JP | |||
05 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kunihiko 3-14, Higashitokiwadai 9-chome, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-0103 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2006/22] | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772317.6 | 27.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004JP12361 | Priority number, date | JP20030311936 | 03.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003311936 | [2006/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023287 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661578 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661578 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K9/70, A61P17/02, A61P9/00, A61P43/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61L26/0047 (EP,US);
A61K38/1833 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR PRÄVENTION UND HEILUNG VON HAUTGESCHWÜREN MIT HUMANEM REKOMBINANTEM HGF | [2006/22] | English: | SKIN ULCER PREVENTIVE CURATIVE AGENT CONTAINING HUMAN RECOMBINANT HGF | [2006/22] | French: | AGENT CURATIF ET PREVENTIF DE L'ULCERE DE LA PEAU CONTENANT UN HGF DE RECOMBINAISON HUMAIN | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2006 | Translation filed | 01.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2004 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | IE | 27.08.2018 | LU | 27.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.08.2004 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0461560 (NAKAMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,11-12 * figure 3; claims 1-3 * * page 6, column 9, line 31 - line 43 *; | [X]EP0462277 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-12 * * page 2, line 3 - line 10 * * figures 15-16 *; | [AD]EP0492614 (NAKAMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP0550769 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-12 * claim 8 * * figure 2 * * page 1, line 3 - line 12 *; | [X]WO9414845 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,11-12 * page 29 - page 40 * * claims 1-6 * * page 1, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]WO0078259 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-31 * | International search | [A]JPH07179356 (NAKAMURA TOSHIICHI); | [X]US5821223 (RUBIN JEFFREY S [US], et al); | [Y] - TOYODA, M. ET AL, "Overexpression of hepacyte growth factor/scatter factor promotes vascularizatio n and granulation tissue formation in vivo", FEBS LETTER, (2001), vol. 509, pages 95 - 100, XP004329151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)03126-X | [A] - SEKI, T. ET AL, "Isolation and expression of cdna for different forms of hepatocyte growth factorfrom human leukocyte", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1990), vol. 172, no. 1, pages 321 - 327, XP002084490 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(05)80212-8 | Examination | - FRANKLIN H. EPSTEIN, "Cutaneous wound healing", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1999), pages 738 - 746 | - S. YOSHIDA ET AL, "Recombinant Hepatocyte Growth Factor Accelerates Cutaneous Wound Healing in a Diabetic Mouse Model", GROWTH FACTORS, (200406), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 111 - 119 | - N. SHIMA ET AL, "Hepatocyte Growth Factor and its Variant with a Deletion of Five Amino Acids are Distinguishable in their Biological Activity and Tertiary Structure", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1994), vol. 200, no. 2, pages 808 - 815 | - Y. SHIRIKATA ET AL, SAIBOUZOUSYOKUINSI TO SAISEIIRYOU, (2006), pages 126 - 130 |