EP1668721 - ALKALINE DRY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADACHI, Mitsuji Matsushita Electr. Ind.Co.Ltd 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Shuji Matsushita Electr. Ind.Co.Ltd 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
OKUBO, Takeshi Matsushita Electr. Ind.Co.Ltd 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04772415.8 | 24.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004JP12459 | Priority number, date | JP20030302681 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003302681 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022673 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668721 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668721 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M6/08 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
H01M6/08 (EP,US);
H01M6/085 (EP,US);
H01M50/4295 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M50/469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKALIN-TROCKENBATTERIE | [2006/24] | English: | ALKALINE DRY BATTERY | [2006/24] | French: | PILE ALCALINE SECHE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | PT | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | IE | 24.08.2010 | LU | 24.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPH10334878 ; | [XY]US5789102 (JACUS ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 19 - line 64 * * column 3, line 30 - line 32 * * column 4, line 6 - line 66 * * column 5, line 19 - line 63 * * claims 1,4,7,8,12,15,18,19 * [Y] 4; | [AY]WO9960636 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 8, line 12 - line 13 * * page 8, line 22 - line 23 * * page 13, line 16 - line 17 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1-4,9 * [Y] 4; | [XY]US6099987 (DANIEL-IVAD JOSEF [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 2,5 * * column 3, line 2 - line 15 * * column 3, line 45 - line 55 * * column 4, line 24 - line 51 * * column 5, line 51 - line 54 * * column 6, line 6 - line 8 * * claims 1,4,6,8,11,13 * [Y] 4 | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10334878 A 19981218 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4 |